Global Patent Index - EP 1046822 A2

EP 1046822 A2 2000-10-25 - Blower and scroll casing

Title (en)

Blower and scroll casing

Title (de)

Gebläse mit einem Spiralgehäuse

Title (fr)

Soufflante et boîtier helicoidal

Publication

EP 1046822 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108259 A

Priority

DE 19918085 A

Abstract (en)

The blower has a rotor (2) rotatably located in a spiral housing. Blades (5) are distributed on the rotor periphery and a concentric suction aperture (7) is enclosed by a cover plate (6) connected on one side to the blades. The flow coming from the suction aperture in the central space sector of the rotor is deflected in an arc of approximately 90 degrees through the blades. The side of each blade facing the cover plate forms a multiply curved line, which is at least virtually vertical on the out of the blade and from there curves outwards, in order to form an arc open to the blade in the vicinity of the suction aperture a ends at a distance from the aperture approximately at its level.

Abstract (de)

Der drehbar gelagerten Rotor des Gebläses, insbesondere eines Gebläse für die Förderung von Prozeßluft oder Kühlluft in einem Haushaltwäschetrockner, hat am Umfang verteilte Schaufeln und eine konzentrische Ansaugöffnung, die von einer mit den Schaufeln einseitig verbundenen Deckscheibe derart umgeben ist, daß die Strömung im zentralen Raumsektor des Rotors von der Ansaugöffnung kommend in einem Bogen von annähernd 90° durch die Schaufeln hindurch umgelenkt wird. Zur Verbesserung des Gebläsewirkungsgrades und Verminderung der vom Gebläse erzeugten Geräusche bildet die der Deckscheibe zugewandte Seite jeder Schaufel eine mehrfach gekrümmte Linie, die wenigstens annähernd senkrecht auf der Außenseite der Schaufel steht und sich von dort nach außen krümmt, um in der Nähe der Ansaugöffnung einen zur Schaufel hin offenen Bogen zu bilden, und mit Abstand zur Ansaugöffnung etwa in deren Höhe endet, wo sie kontinuierlich in die Innenseite der Schaufel übergeht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/28; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/282 (2013.01); F04D 29/661 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3137554 A1 19830331 - GEBHARDT GMBH WILHELM [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046822 A2 20001025; EP 1046822 A3 20021009; EP 1046822 B1 20041110; DE 19918085 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008560 P 20041216

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI