Global Patent Index - EP 1046874 A2

EP 1046874 A2 2000-10-25 - Dryer with integrated cooling unit

Title (en)

Dryer with integrated cooling unit

Title (de)

Trockner mit integrierter Kühleinheit

Title (fr)

Sécheur avec unité de refroidissement intégré

Publication

EP 1046874 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107460 A

Priority

DE 19918669 A

Abstract (en)

The drier (1) is for a material web being processed in a rotary printing machine. The surface of the web is applied with ink The drier has a housing (9) divided into sections (1.1, 1.2, 1.3) and which contains a web running plane (12) in which the web is transported. In the housing a cooling and conditioning unit (2) is integrated, through which the fresh air (18) enters the housi The cooling and conditioning unit contains one or more cooling rollers (27), over which the web (32) is guided. The rollers so arranged and the fresh air is so conducted through the cooling and conditioning unit that subsequently evaporated solvent is into the cooling and conditioning unit and no solvent vapor reaches operating personnel outside the housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Trockner für Materialbahnen, auf deren Oberfläche Farbe aufgetragen ist, mit einem Gehäuse (9). Das Gehäuse (9) ist in Sektionen (1.1, 1.2, 1.3) unterteilt und enthält eine Bahnlaufebene (12), in der die Materialbahn transportiert wird. Eine Kühl- und Konditioniereinheit (2) ist in das Gehäuse (9) des Trockners (1) integriert, wobei Prozeßluft (18) in das Gehäuse (9) des Trockners (1) durch die Kühl- und Konditioniereinheit (2) eintritt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/10; F26B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B41F 23/02 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01); F26B 13/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/02 (2013.01); F26B 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046874 A2 20001025; EP 1046874 A3 20010912; EP 1046874 B1 20050202; DE 19918669 A1 20001026; JP 2000343675 A 20001212; US 6481118 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120406

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120406

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GOSS CONTIWEB B.V.

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-05-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009387 P 20050310

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOSS CONTIWEB B.V.

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI