Global Patent Index - EP 1046878 A1

EP 1046878 A1 2000-10-25 - Safety container for transport and/or storage of explosive devices

Title (en)

Safety container for transport and/or storage of explosive devices

Title (de)

Sicherheitsbehälter für den Transport und/oder die Lagerung von Explosionskörpern

Title (fr)

Conteneur de sécurité pour le transport et/ou le stockage d'engins explosifs

Publication

EP 1046878 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00106786 A

Priority

FR 9905228 A

Abstract (en)

First barrier between the explosive device (2) and the exterior, comprises: a first internal wall (5) of ductile material, w minimum elongation at rupture of 30% and resilience of at least 200 J/cm<2>; walls (8, 8a, 8b) combining a first wall or damping layer (6, 6a, 6b) in highly compressible material and a third wall (7, 7a, 7b) in rigid material with an elastic limit o 900 MPa or more.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un conteneur de sécurité (1) pour un engin explosif (2), par exemple une munition, et comprenant au moins une enceinte interne comportant une première cloison entourant au moins longitudinalement l'engin, première cloison comprenant au moins trois parois. Ce conteneur est caractérisé en ce que la première cloison comprend successivement entre l'engin explosif (2) et l'extérieur : une première paroi (5) ou paroi interne réalisée en un matériau ductile et délimitant la cloison du côté de l'engin explosif (2), et au moins une paire (8,8a,8b) de parois formée par la combinaison d'une deuxième paroi ou couche amortissante (6,6a,6b) réalisée en un matériau à haut module de compressibilité volumique et d'une troisième paroi (7,7a,7b) en matériau rigide. Application au stockage et au transport de munitions dangereuses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046878 A1 20001025; FR 2792623 A1 20001027; FR 2792623 B1 20010615

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI