Global Patent Index - EP 1046918 A2

EP 1046918 A2 2000-10-25 - Method and circuit for safety monitoring of an electrostatic spray device

Title (en)

Method and circuit for safety monitoring of an electrostatic spray device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Sicherheitsüberprüfung einer elektrostatischen Sprühanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et circuit pour le control de sécurité d'un dispositif de pulvérisation électrostatique

Publication

EP 1046918 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107319 A

Priority

DE 19915374 A

Abstract (en)

In operation, electrical energy is stored in the system. During breaks in operation, after the high voltage of the energy storage system is switched off, the energy storage system is discharged down to a harmless residual energy before access to the chamber containing the spraying system is allowed. Prior to the start of operation, the capacitance of the energy storage system is meas and stored, and the safe voltage value is calculated. During the breaks in operation after the high voltage is switched off, it ascertained if the voltage measured at the energy storage system has reduced to the safe level or a lower level. An alarm signal a signal preventing access to the chamber is generated if the voltage is unacceptably high. An Independent claim is included for a circuit for safety checking of a spraying system.

Abstract (de)

An einer mit Hochspannung betriebenen elektrostatischen Sprühanlage soll nach dem Abschalten der Hochspannung geprüft werden, ob die Restenergie, die noch in dem vom Hochspannungserzeuger (1) gespeisten Energiespeichersystem verblieben ist, auf einen ungefährlichen Wert abgesunken ist. Hierzu wird der Wert der elektrischen Kapazität des Energiespeichersystems bestimmt, und der Istwert der an diesem System liegenden Spannung wird gemessen. Anhand dieser Werte und unter Ausnutzung der naturgesetzlichen Beziehung, die zwischen elektrischer Spannung, elektrischer Kapazität und elektrischer Energie besteht, wird nach dem Abschalten der Hochspannung ermittelt, ob die Restenergie einen als ungefährlich vorgegebenen Wert überschreitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 19/155

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915374 A1 20001012; EP 1046918 A2 20001025; EP 1046918 A3 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01R 19/155 A, 7B 05B 5/10 B, 7G 01R 29/24 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI