Global Patent Index - EP 1046965 A1

EP 1046965 A1 2000-10-25 - Self-winding watch

Title (en)

Self-winding watch

Title (de)

Uhrwerk mit Schwungmassen-Selbstaufzug

Title (fr)

Montre à remontage automatique

Publication

EP 1046965 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810342 A

Priority

EP 99810342 A

Abstract (en)

Automatic rewind mass (1) rotates around a ball bearing (3), with a reduction gear chain to transmit the bi- directional rotational movement to a barrel shaft with an inverter mechanism to convert the bi-directional movement to unidirectional moveme of the barrel shaft. The central part of the rewind mass is shaped to support the inverter mechanism surround by the ball race o the ball bearing (3). One ball race (3a) surrounds the inverter mechanism the other (3b) is integral with the detachable means of positioning of watch frame (6).

Abstract (fr)

Cette montre à remontage automatique comprend une masse de remontage automatique (1, 2), un roulement à billes (3) pour monter cette masse de remontage automatique, pivotante autour d'un axe du bâti de la montre, un train d'engrenages réducteurs (15-18) pour relier cette masse de remontage automatique (1, 2) à un arbre de barillet (19) et un mécanisme inverseur (7-12) pour transformer le mouvement de rotation bidirectionnelle de ladite masse de remontage automatique (1, 2) en un mouvement de rotation unidirectionnelle, transmis audit arbre de barillet (19). La partie centrale (2) de ladite masse de remontage automatique est conformée pour ménager une zone de support et de pivotement aux organes dudit mécanisme inverseur (7-12), entourée par un des chemins de roulement (3a) dudit roulement à billes (3), dont l'autre chemin de roulement (3b) est solidaire de moyens de positionnement et de fixation amovible (5-5e) au bâti (6) de la montre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 5/14; G04B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 5/19 (2006.01); G04B 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 5/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046965 A1 20001025; EP 1046965 B1 20040818; DE 69919509 D1 20040923; DE 69919509 T2 20050901; JP 2000321370 A 20001124; JP 4047516 B2 20080213; US 6409379 B1 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLEX SA, CH

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090423

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090423

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080408

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-03-04 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029840

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919509 P 20040923

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLEX SA

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI