Global patent index - EP 1046967 A1

EP 1046967 A1 2000-10-25 - Method for mounting a casing-ring in a watch case and case-ring used in said method

Title (en)

Method for mounting a casing-ring in a watch case and case-ring used in said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Montieren eines Gehäuseringes in einem Uhrengehäuse und dafür verwendbarer Gehäusering

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage d'un cercle d'encageage dans une boîte de montre et cercle d'encageage satisfaisant à ce procédé

Publication

EP 1046967 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99107968 A

Priority

EP 99107968 A

Abstract (en)

Procedure has the following steps: a plastic encasing circle (3) is fixed in the watch housing (6) by use of deformable plas edges (70). As the circle is pushed into the housing the edges deform and insertion is stopped when the circle occupies a positi fixed with respect to the housing. An Independent claim is made for a plastic encasing circle.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé d'assemblage et de fixation d'un cercle d'encageage (3) dans une boîte de montre (6) utilise un cercle fait en matière plastiquement déformable équipé de moyens (60, 70) venus de matière avec le cercle et susceptibles de le positionner par rapport à la boîte. On introduit le cercle dans la boîte, ce qui provoque la déformation plastique des moyens de positionnement. On interrompt cette introduction quand le cercle occupe une position déterminée par rapport à la boîte. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/14 (2006.01); G04B 37/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/05 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49579 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046967 A1 20001025; EP 1046967 B1 20070328; CN 1145085 C 20040407; CN 1271875 A 20001101; DE 69935656 D1 20070510; DE 69935656 T2 20071213; HK 1032119 A1 20050128; JP 2000321375 A 20001124; JP 4611487 B2 20110112; US 6575619 B1 20030610

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100422

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100422

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2007-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69935656

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-05-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI