Global Patent Index - EP 1046969 A1

EP 1046969 A1 2000-10-25 - Method for controlling a stepping motor and means to apply this method

Title (en)

Method for controlling a stepping motor and means to apply this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Schrittmotors und Vorrichtung zur Anwendung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un moteur pas à pas et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1046969 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99108060 A

Priority

EP 99108060 A

Abstract (en)

Control procedure involves sub-dividing the stepper motor period into elementary periods and from calculations using the elementary periods determination of how the long the motor impulse has lasted and deciding whether the motor coil should be connected to a power source or not so that the motor is driven at the correct rate. Each motor impulse is chopped into a number of elementary periods of the same duration. For each elementary period an effec chopping rate (He) is determined where He = n1 divided by n2, where n1 is the total number of periods for which the motor coil h been connected to the source since the start of the motor impulse and n2 is the total number of periods since the start of the m impulse. If He is Hc, where Hc is the ordered stepper rate then the coil is connected if He greater than Hc then the motor is disconnected.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé consiste à subdiviser chaque impulsion motrice en un certain nombre de périodes élémentaires de mêmes durées, à calculer directement ou indirectement, à chaque période élémentaire, la valeur d'un taux de hachage effectif He tel que He = n1/n2 où n1 est le nombre de périodes élémentaires pendant lesquelles la bobine du moteur a été connectée à la source d'énergie électrique depuis le début de l'impulsion motrice et n2 est le nombre total de ces périodes élémentaires depuis ce début de l'impulsion motrice, à comparer ce taux effectif He au taux de hachage de consigne Hc et, selon que He <= Hc ou que He >Hc, à connecter, ou non, la bobine du moteur à la source d'énergie électrique depuis le début de la période élémentaire suivante. Le dispositif comporte les moyens nécessaires à la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé. Ce procédé et ce dispositif permettent d'augmenter le nombre de taux distincts disponibles pour hacher les impulsions motrices d'une manière beaucoup plus simple qu'avec les procédés et dispositifs connus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046969 A1 20001025; EP 1046969 B1 20071212; DE 69937731 D1 20080124; DE 69937731 T2 20081120

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080317

2008-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937731 P 20080124

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2007-12-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI