Global Patent Index - EP 1046990 A2

EP 1046990 A2 2000-10-25 - Methods and apparatus for storage and retrieval of name space information in a distributed computing system

Title (en)

Methods and apparatus for storage and retrieval of name space information in a distributed computing system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Speichern und Wiederauffinden von Informationen über den Namenraum in einem verteilten Rechnersystem

Title (fr)

Méthodes et dispositif pour le stockage et le recouvrement d'informations concernant l'espace des noms dans un système informatique distribué

Publication

EP 1046990 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00117414 A

Priority

  • EP 96302502 A
  • US 42413795 A

Abstract (en)

A computing environment (100) includes terminals (105-110) with central processor unit (CPU) servers (120,121) and file servers (130,131) and the CPU servers preferably concentrate computing power into large multi-processors, while the file servers provide repositories for storage of files utilized by the terminals and the CPU servers. The components are connected through a communication network (150) such as a lower speed network connection, connecting the terminals to other resources in the distributed computing environment. An independent claim is included for a method for identifying a path-name associated with a given channel in the system.

A distributed computing environment is disclosed which allows a user at one location to access resources at other locations. Each resource in the distributed computing environment is represented as a hierarchical file system. A user or process has a name space comprised of at least one hierarchical file system provided by a connected resource. The distributed computing environment allows a first processor to invoke execution of a processing task by a remote processor. The first processor transmits a representation of its current name space to the remote processor. The remote processor will execute the processing task on a name space modified in accordance with the name space representation received from the first processor. The transmitted representation of the name space associated with the first processor includes at least one dynamic name space modification command, such as those executed by a user after logging into the distributed computing system. A plurality of data structures are provided for storing path information which allows the pathname of a given channel, which represents a file, to be determined. The stored path information allows the hierarchical file tree of a connected file system to be generated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/50 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/50 (2013.01); G06F 17/30067 (2013.01); G06F 2209/463 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99942 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738970 A1 19961023; CA 2172644 A1 19961018; CA 2172644 C 20010515; DE 69625724 D1 20030213; EP 1046990 A2 20001025; EP 1046990 A3 20001102; EP 1046990 B1 20030108; JP H08339355 A 19961224; MX 9601398 A 19970430; US 5724512 A 19980303

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-11-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-04-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625724 P 20030213

2003-01-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 738970

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINTERBOTTOM, PHILIP STEVEN

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 9/46 A, 7G 06F 17/30 B

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-10-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 738970

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB