Global patent index - EP 1047025 A3

EP 1047025 A3 2000-12-20 - Method and apparatus for detecting misuse of postal indica

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for detecting misuse of postal indica

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Feststellen des Missbrauchs von Postwertzeichen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour détecter l'usage illicite de marques d'affranchissement

Publication

EP 1047025 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108083 A

Priority

US 29919999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1047025A2] Involves storing in a memory an information signal indicating a postal indicia applied at a sender location on a mail piece to be posted. The postal indicia is characteristic of a device which applied the postal indicia to the mail piece to be sent. The applied postal indicia is also characteristic of the mail piece to be posted. At the post office the postal indicia is read and provides a second information signal indicating the read postal indicia; the read postal indicia characteristic of a device which applied the read postal indicia, and the read postal indicia is also characteristic of the received mail piece. The first information signal is retrieved from the memory and compared with the second information signal giving a misuse signal when no match is found. An independent claim is included for an apparatus for detecting misuse.

[origin: EP1047025A2] A method for detecting misuse of postal indicia, and an apparatus for executing the method. The method includes the steps of storing a first information signal indicative of a postal indicia on a mail piece to be posted, sensing a postal indicia on a received mail piece for providing a second information signal indicative of the sensed postal indicia, retrieving the first information signal, and comparing the first information signal with the second information signal for providing a misuse signal if the first information signal is not the same as the second information signal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00169 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00443 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047025 A2 20001025; EP 1047025 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040615

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-01-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING MISUSE OF POSTAL INDICIA

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/04 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI