Global Patent Index - EP 1047032 A3

EP 1047032 A3 2001-03-21 - Magnetic mark-strips and production method thereof

Title (en)

Magnetic mark-strips and production method thereof

Title (de)

Magnetischer Markierstreifen und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines magnetischen Markierstreifens

Title (fr)

Bandelettes de marquage magnétiques et leurs procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1047032 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108525 A

Priority

DE 19918589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1047032A2] The magnetic marker strip has a signal strip that is cut (6) from a strip of amorphous, ductile, almost magnetostrictive all The signal trip is cut transversely to the longitudinal axis of the alloy strip, which has a flat B-H loop arranged with its axi parallel to its longitudinal axis. An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing magnetic marker strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24; H01F 1/153

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01); H01F 1/153 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2437 (2013.01); G08B 13/244 (2013.01); G08B 13/2442 (2013.01); H01F 1/15316 (2013.01); H01F 1/15341 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1084 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047032 A2 20001025; EP 1047032 A3 20010321; EP 1047032 B1 20040102; DE 19918589 A1 20001026; US 6313746 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004900 P 20040205

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI