Global patent index - EP 1047037 A1

EP 1047037 A1 2000-10-25 - Display device

Title (en)

Display device

Title (de)

Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1047037 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107799 A

Priority

DE 29906981 U

Abstract (en)

The display device has an at least partially transparent body divided over its length, preferably into seven zones, whereby of the zones has an illumination device. The body can be colored with different colors, preferably white or yellow. The illumina devices can be separately controlled by a controller.

Abstract (de)

Eine Anzeigevorrichtung (10) mit einem mindestens teilweise transparenten Körper, der über seine Länge in mehrere Zonen (11 bis 17) vorzugsweise in sieben Zonen (11 bis 17) unterteilt ist, wobei jede der Zonen (11 bis 17) mit einer Beleuchtungseinrichtung ausgestattet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906981 U1 19990701; EP 1047037 A1 20001025

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031101

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CM-ELECTRONIC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROBOPOULOS, NICOLAS

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBOPOULOS, NICOLAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROBOPOULOS, NICOLAS

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI