Global Patent Index - EP 1047044 A1

EP 1047044 A1 2000-10-25 - Device for acquiring and processing signals to control an apparatus or a process

Title (en)

Device for acquiring and processing signals to control an apparatus or a process

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erfassung und Verarbeitung von Signalen um ein Gerät oder einen Prozess zu steueren

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'acquisition et de traitement de signaux pour la commande d'un appareil ou d'un processus

Publication

EP 1047044 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400869 A

Priority

FR 9905151 A

Abstract (en)

The signal acquisition and processing mechanism has a mechanism processing digital words, analogue-digital conversion of signal inputs and command signal transmission. Detected signals (C1) are input to a command and modification unit (50) which drives a processor (54). The processors adds sound signals to the loudspeaker output (60). The command and modification unit has modification knobs (44), a menu selection mechanism (42) and a display mechanism.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif d'acquisition et de traitement de signaux pour la commande d'un appareil ou d'un processus, le dispositif (50) comprenant des entrées recevant des signaux analogiques fournis par des capteurs (C1, ...) et les traitant pour transmettre à l'appareil (54) des signaux de commande configurés conformément à un protocole de communication prédéterminé, le dispositif (50) comprenant des moyens (38, 40) du type écran-clavier d'accès à des paramètres de configuration des signaux de commande et de modification de ces paramètres. L'invention s'applique par exemple à la commande d'appareils produisant des effets sonores ajoutés ou appliqués au son d'un instrument. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10H 1/00; G10H 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/00 (2006.01); G10H 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/0066 (2013.01); G10H 3/188 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047044 A1 20001025; EP 1047044 B1 20050706; DE 60021142 D1 20050811; DE 60021142 T2 20060511; FR 2792747 A1 20001027; FR 2792747 B1 20010622; US 6281830 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130329

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021142

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60021142

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60021142

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2005-11-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021142 P 20050811

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040702

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI