Global Patent Index - EP 1047091 A3

EP 1047091 A3 2002-11-27 - Fuse particularly high power fuse

Title (en)

Fuse particularly high power fuse

Title (de)

Sicherung, insbesondere Hochleistungssicherung

Title (fr)

Fusible en particulier fusible à haute puissance

Publication

EP 1047091 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108424 A

Priority

DE 19917425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1047091A2] The fuse has at least one melting conductor a mechanism for mechanically breaking it and an arrangement for triggering the mechanical breaking mechanism. The triggering arrangement contains at least one pressure capsule (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/36; H01H 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/36 (2006.01); H01H 39/00 (2006.01); H01H 85/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/36 (2013.01); H01H 39/006 (2013.01); H01H 85/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047091 A2 20001025; EP 1047091 A3 20021127; EP 1047091 B1 20050330; AT 292324 T 20050415; DE 19917425 A1 20001026; DK 1047091 T3 20050711; ES 2239959 T3 20051016; NO 20002066 A 20001020; NO 20002066 D0 20000418; NO 317780 B1 20041213; PT 1047091 E 20050729

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170501

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170407

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-02-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140418

2013-07-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239959 T3

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-07-12 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401929

2005-07-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009891 P 20050504

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NELLEN, UDO

2005-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUENGER, STEFAN

2005-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROTE, MARTIN

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040804

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021207

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI