Global Patent Index - EP 1047094 A1

EP 1047094 A1 2000-10-25 - Self-recovering current-limiting device with liquid metal

Title (en)

Self-recovering current-limiting device with liquid metal

Title (de)

Selbsterholende Strombegrenzungseinrichtung mit Flüssigmetall

Title (fr)

Dispositif limiteur de courant à auto-rétablissement et doté de métal liquide

Publication

EP 1047094 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108135 A

Priority

DE 19918453 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1047093A1] The current limiter has solid metal electrodes (4) for connecting to a circuit to be protected and several compression chamb (7,8) partially filled with liquid metal (6), arranged in series between the electrodes and formed by pressure-tight insulating bodies (11,12) and insulating intermediate walls held by them with connecting channels (10). At least one compression vol. adjac to an electrode is formed by a piston-cylinder device whose piston (16) is connected to the adjacent electrode and can be moved towards the adjacent electrode against a restoring mechanism (17). The elastic restoring mechanism at least partly provides the electrical connection between the piston and the adjacent electrode and is compressed by electrodynamic forces driving the pisto a defined value of current through the restoring mechanism is exceeded

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine selbsterholende Strombegrenzungseinrichtung mit Flüssigmetall. Sie enthält Elektroden (3; 4) aus Festmetall zum Anschließen an einen zu schützenden Stromkreis und mehrere mit Flüssigmetall (6) teilweise aufgefüllte, hintereinander liegende Verdichterräume (7; 8). Zwischen den Verdichterräumen (7; 8) sind isolierende Zwischenwände (9) mit Verbindungskanälen (10) angeordnet. Der der Elektrode (4) benachbarte Verdichterraum (8) wird durch eine abdichtende Zylinder-Kolben-Einrichtung (15, 16) gebildet. Deren Kolben (16) ist mit der benachbarten Elektrode (4) elektrisch leitend verbunden und in Richtung der benachbarten Elektrode (4) entgegen eines Rückstellmittels (17) verschiebbar. Der Kolben (16) weist einen nach außen durch die benachbarte Elektrode (4) reichenden Stößel (20) auf, der mit Rastmitteln (21, 22) in Verbindung steht, die eine selbsttätige Rückstellbewegung des Kolbens (16) verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 87/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 87/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 87/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047094 A1 20001025; EP 1047094 B1 20060412; DE 19918453 A1 20001026; DE 50012424 D1 20060511; DE 50012548 D1 20060524; EP 1047093 A1 20001025; EP 1047093 B1 20060322

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060430

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-11-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012548 P 20060524

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI