Global patent index - EP 1047143 A8

EP 1047143 A8 2001-03-14 - Fuel cell comprising a separator provided with coolant passages

Title (en)

Fuel cell comprising a separator provided with coolant passages

Title (de)

Brennstoffzelle mit Kühlkanälen enthaltende Separator

Title (fr)

Pile à combustible pourvue d'un séparateur à passages de refroidissement

Publication

EP 1047143 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00300871 A

Priority

JP 3176099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1047143A2] A separator (14) has anode and cathode lateral electrodes on sides of an electrolyte film. Heating gas inlets (36a,52a), outlets (36b,52b), oxidizing gas inlets (38a,54a), outlets (38b,54b) and cooling medium inlets (40a, 56a), outlets (40b, 56b) are provided in separators. Main and auxiliary flow passages (48a,48b,50a-50d) are provided between cooling medium inlet and outlets, along separators surface.

[origin: EP1047143A2] Each of cooling medium flow passages (46a to 46f) provided for a first separator (14) includes single main flow passage grooves (48a, 48b) communicating with a cooling medium inlet (40a) and a cooling medium outlet (40b) respectively, and branched flow passage grooves (50a to 50d) formed and branched between the main flow passage grooves (48a, 48b). Accordingly, it is possible to greatly decrease the flow passage length. Therefore, it is possible to effectively avoid the occurrence of flow passage pressure loss in the superficial direction of the first separator (14), and it is possible to improve the system efficiency of the power generation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 8/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 8/04 (2006.01); H01M 8/10 (2006.01); H01M 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/0263 (2013.01); H01M 8/0267 (2013.01); H01M 8/241 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047143 A2 20001025; EP 1047143 A3 20030813; EP 1047143 A8 20010314; EP 1047143 B1 20100602; CA 2298160 A1 20000809; CA 2298160 C 20060502; DE 60044477 D1 20100715; JP 2000231929 A 20000822; JP 3530054 B2 20040524; US 6406809 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160203

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-01-10 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 60044477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121113

2012-12-05 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20121113

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60044477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60044477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FUJII, YOSUKE

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUGITA, NARUTOSHI

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WARIISHI, YOSHINORI

2010-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUZUKI, MASAHARU

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070402

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI