Global Patent Index - EP 1047150 B1

EP 1047150 B1 2002-09-04 - Thin film wide band coupler

Title (en)

Thin film wide band coupler

Title (de)

Dünnschicht-Breitbandkoppler

Title (fr)

Coupleur à bande large et à couche mince

Publication

EP 1047150 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00201151 A

Priority

DE 19915246 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915246A1] The coupler has carrier substrate and two strip lines. A component is integrated in the secondary coupler loop which causes a phase shift of the frequency of the decoupled signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/02 (2006.01); H01P 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/184 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915246 A1 20001005; EP 1047150 A1 20001025; EP 1047150 B1 20020904; JP 2000315903 A 20001114; JP 4264182 B2 20090513; US 6600386 B1 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES GENERAL IP (SINGAPORE) PTE., SG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BROADCOM CORPORATION, IRVINE, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 50000436

2017-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000436

- Representative's name: BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2015-03-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BROADCOM CORPORATION, IRVINE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 50000436

- Effective date: 20150211

2015-03-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES GENERAL IP (SINGAPORE) PTE., SG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 50000436

- Effective date: 20150211

2015-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000436

- Representative's name: BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150211

2015-02-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000436

- Representative's name: BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130328

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000436 20021010

2002-10-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI