Global Patent Index - EP 1047152 A3

EP 1047152 A3 2001-12-12 - Electrical socket

Title (en)

Electrical socket

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussbuchse

Title (fr)

Contact électrique femelle

Publication

EP 1047152 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108102 A

Priority

DE 19918326 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1047152A2] The socket has a connecting section (12) for making connection with electrical conductive wire entering the connector. There a resilient spring (20) included in the socket section (14), to form a socket surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/18; H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/112 (2013.01); H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047152 A2 20001025; EP 1047152 A3 20011212; EP 1047152 B1 20070214; DE 19918326 A1 20001026; DE 50014046 D1 20070329

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-09-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070525

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014046 P 20070329

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/18 A, 7H 01R 13/115 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI