Global patent index - EP 1047165 A1

EP 1047165 A1 2000-10-25 - Barrier electrodes for surface treatment of electrical conductive or non-conductie materials and arrangment of such barrier electrodes

Title (en)

Barrier electrodes for surface treatment of electrical conductive or non-conductie materials and arrangment of such barrier electrodes

Title (de)

Barrierenelektrode zur Oberflächenbehandlung von elektrisch leitenden oder nichtleitenden Materialien sowie Anordnung derartiger Barrierenelektroden

Title (fr)

Electrodes barrières pour le traîtement de surfaces de matériaux électriques conducteurs ou non-conducteurs ainsi que arrangement de telles électrodes barrières

Publication

EP 1047165 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107861 A

Priority

EP 99107861 A

Abstract (en)

Barrier electrode, comprising a dielectric tube (2) with a high voltage conductor channel (4) parallel to a heat regulating process gas supply channel (3). A barrier electrode, for surface treating electroconductive or non-conductive materials with medium frequency electrical discharges, is in the form of a dielectric tube (2) with two mutually parallel channels (3, 4) extending in the length direction one channel (4) being provided with a high voltage conductor (5) facing a counter-electrode (7) during use and the other channel being used for heating medium or process gas supply. An Independent claim is also included for a barrier electrode arrangement comprising two or more of the above barrier electrodes.

Abstract (de)

Die Barrierenelektrode besteht aus einem Rohr (2) aus dielektrischem Material mit zwei parallel zueinander in Längsrichtung verlaufenden Kanälen (3,4), von denen der in Gebrauchslage einer Gegenelektrode (8) zugekehrte erste Kanal (4) mit einem Hochspannungsleiter (5) versehen ist, und der andere, zweite Kanal (3) zur Zuführung eines Temperiermediums oder eines Prozeßgases dient. Durch diese besondere Ausbildung werden mit Sicherheit Gleitentladungen im Bereich der Haltekomponente für die Barrierenelektrode vermieden. Hierdurch wird insgesamt die Lebensdauer bei einem besseren Oberflächenbehandlungsergebnis erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 19/00; B29C 59/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 7/00 (2006.01); B29C 59/12 (2006.01); H01T 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 19/00 (2013.01); B29C 59/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1047165 A1 20001025; EP 1047165 B1 20020313; AT 214521 T 20020315; DE 59900978 D1 20020418; DK 1047165 T3 20020521; JP 2001006844 A 20010112; US 6361748 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SOFTAL CORONA & PLASMA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900978

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110817

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900978

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RAFFAY & FLECK PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110817

2011-08-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900978

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RAFFAY & FLECK, PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2010-10-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100923 AND 20100929

2010-07-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-06-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020421

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900978

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214521

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI