Global Patent Index - EP 1047309 A1

EP 1047309 A1 2000-11-02 - LACE TENSIONING SYSTEM

Title (en)

LACE TENSIONING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHNÜRVERSCHLUSSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TENSIONNEMENT DE LACET

Publication

EP 1047309 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901008 A

Priority

  • GB 9900025 W
  • GB 9800931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935929A1] A lace tensioning system comprises a plurality of teeth (18) on an edge of a flap (10), each tooth having a first opening (26) therethrough and a lace (32) threaded through the teeth alternately with an article (12) to which the lace tensioning system is to be connected, whereby tensioning of the lace draws the teeth and the article towards each other, means on the lace for taking up slack in the lace comprising a peg (70) on the lace, which peg is locatable in a selectable component (30) of the system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 1/04; A43C 3/02; A43C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 1/04 (2006.01); A43C 3/02 (2006.01); A43C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 7/00 (2013.01); A43C 1/04 (2013.01); A43C 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935929A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935929 A1 19990722; AU 2064499 A 19990802; DE 69900586 D1 20020124; EP 1047309 A1 20001102; EP 1047309 B1 20011212; GB 9800931 D0 19980311; JP 2002508979 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-01-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-03-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900586 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT