Global Patent Index - EP 1047312 A1

EP 1047312 A1 2000-11-02 - HAIR SHAPING DEVICE AND HAIR SHAPING METHOD

Title (en)

HAIR SHAPING DEVICE AND HAIR SHAPING METHOD

Title (de)

HAARFORMGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN DER HAARE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET TECHNIQUE DE MISE EN PLIS

Publication

EP 1047312 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947548 A

Priority

  • DE 19748067 A
  • EP 9806092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748067A1] The invention relates to a hair shaping device comprising a handle section (31) and a heating section with a preferably dome-shaped heating area for heating and reshaping hair, in addition to a cooling section (41) with a cooling area for cooling the hair thus reshaped. The temperature difference between the surface temperatures of the heating areas and the cooling areas is at least 80 kelvin and especially 100 kelvin. The invention also relates to a method for reshaping hair, especially using a hair shaping device with the above-mentioned characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 1/04; A45D 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 1/04 (2006.01); A45D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 1/04 (2013.01); A45D 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748067 A1 19990512; AU 9441798 A 19990524; CA 2308238 A1 19990514; CA 2308238 C 20040608; DE 59803576 D1 20020502; EP 1047312 A1 20001102; EP 1047312 B1 20020327; JP 2001521770 A 20011113; JP 2009136694 A 20090625; JP 4268754 B2 20090527; JP 4833300 B2 20111207; US 6354305 B1 20020312; WO 9922622 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-14 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59803576

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-10-31 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59803576

- Effective date: 20110906

2012-07-04 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59803576

2011-09-06 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59803576

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-09-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803576 20020502

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE