Global Patent Index - EP 1047316 A1

EP 1047316 A1 2000-11-02 - HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE TABLE OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE TABLE OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

HÖHENVERSTELLBARER TISCH ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

TABLE REGLABLE EN HAUTEUR OU ANALOGUE

Publication

EP 1047316 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98900068 A

Priority

CH 9800010 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935936A1] The height-adjustable table (22) comprises a base (1), a support (3) to hold a table top (21), a movable connecting element (2) which mounts the support (3) in a height-adjustable manner in relation to the base (1) and a pneumatic, pressure actuated weight counterbalancing element (7) which is fluidly connected to a reservoir (4) and is arranged between the base (1) and the support (3) in such a way that a reaction force is generated to counteract a gravitational force G acting on the support (3). The weight counterbalancing element (7) and the reservoir form a closed volume containing fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/02 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935936A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935936 A1 19990722; AT 215328 T 20020415; AU 5305598 A 19990802; DE 59803677 D1 20020508; EP 1047316 A1 20001102; EP 1047316 B1 20020403; US 6283047 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803677 20020508

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-04-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215328 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI