Global Patent Index - EP 1047322 A1

EP 1047322 A1 2000-11-02 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO DISPLAY UNITS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO DISPLAY UNITS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN AN AUSSTELLUNGSEINHEITEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AUX UNITES D'ETALAGE

Publication

EP 1047322 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942116 A

Priority

  • GB 9702624 W
  • GB 9619952 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812950A1] A display unit (10) with a box-like rectangular frame with end walls (11, 12), a base (13) with wheels or castors (15) and top wall (14) has an interior which is intended to display objects. The sides of the unit are either left open or else covered with transparent removable panels to allow the interior to be viewed. A lighting system (16, 17) is built into the unit to illuminate the interior. The objects to be displayed are mounted onto flat or inclined platforms (38) or columns (33) of component (25) detachably mounted onto one of an array of strip-like mounting legs (24) which are carried by base plates (23) slidably fitted into a track (18, 19) in the interior of the unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/00; A47F 3/06; A47F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/06 (2006.01); A47F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/04 (2013.01); A47F 3/001 (2013.01); A47F 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9812950A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812950 A1 19980402; AU 4391297 A 19980417; DE 69719391 D1 20030403; DE 69719391 T2 20040219; EP 1047322 A1 20001102; EP 1047322 B1 20030226; GB 9619952 D0 19961113

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050925

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2005-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050925

2004-11-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69719391 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL