Global Patent Index - EP 1047326 A1

EP 1047326 A1 2000-11-02 - POSITION-ADJUSTABLE SUPPORT DEVICE FOR SUSPENDING A BABY BATH

Title (en)

POSITION-ADJUSTABLE SUPPORT DEVICE FOR SUSPENDING A BABY BATH

Title (de)

ABSTÜTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE KINDERBADEWANNE, IN POSITION VERSTELLBAR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SUPPORT EN SUSPENSION DE BAIGNOIRE POUR BEBE, REGLABLE EN POSITION

Publication

EP 1047326 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900517 A

Priority

  • FR 9900035 W
  • FR 9800472 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773453A1] The bath baby suspension support has its supporting elements (3) arranged near their end zone (3b) located outside the median positioning and fixing zone to the bath. Openings (3c) are made to allow the positioning and locking of removable position selector pegs (4) in sections able to be supported against the sides opposite the adult bath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/034

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/034 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935947A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773453 A1 19990716; FR 2773453 B1 20000303; AU 1973999 A 19990802; EP 1047326 A1 20001102; EP 1047326 B1 20030507; ES 2197599 T3 20040101; WO 9935947 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2010-04-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197599 T3

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR