Global Patent Index - EP 1047333 A1

EP 1047333 A1 2000-11-02 - VACUUM CLEANER

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER

Title (de)

STAUBSAUGER

Title (fr)

ASPIRATEUR

Publication

EP 1047333 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99902541 A

Priority

  • DE 19801445 A
  • EP 9900205 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801445A1] The on-off switch (10) and the potentiometer (11) are provided with a common operating knob (1) which is mounted on the vacuum cleaner housing so that it can move axially and rotationally. The on-off function is provided by axial movement, while the potentiometer function is provided by the rotary movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/28; G05G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/28 (2006.01); G05G 1/02 (2006.01); G05G 1/10 (2006.01); H01H 9/06 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/2857 (2013.01); A47L 9/2842 (2013.01); G05G 1/02 (2013.01); G05G 1/10 (2013.01); H01H 9/061 (2013.01); H01H 25/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935956A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29923278 U1 20000928; DE 19801445 A1 19990722; EP 1047333 A1 20001102; EP 1047333 B1 20021016; TR 200001888 T2 20010221; WO 9935956 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59903089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080115

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-21

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT