Global patent index - EP 1047366 A1

EP 1047366 A1 2000-11-02 - LIFTING/EXTENDING DEVICE FOR A WHEELCHAIR, AND WHEELCHAIR

Title (en)

LIFTING/EXTENDING DEVICE FOR A WHEELCHAIR, AND WHEELCHAIR

Title (de)

HUB-/AUSFAHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ROLLSTUHL, SOWIE ROLLSTUHL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE ET DE DEPLOIEMENT POUR UN FAUTEUIL ROULANT, ET FAUTEUIL ROULANT AINSI EQUIPE

Publication

EP 1047366 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904765 A

Priority

  • DE 19800957 A
  • DE 19817757 A
  • DE 19855178 A
  • EP 9900123 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936023A1] The invention relates to a lifting/extending device for a wheelchair (2), comprising a lower platform (26) which travels on the ground, a travelling mechanism (42, 44) for said lower platform, an upper platform (20) which is mounted on the lower platform (26) by means of a lifting device (28, 30), a lifting drive (32, 34, 60, 62) for the lifting device, a telescopic platform (18) which extends approximately horizontally from the upper platform, and a fixing device (16; 76) for fixing the telescopic platform to the underside of the wheelchair. The lifting/extending device (4) fixed to the underside of the wheelchair fits underneath the wheelchair with said wheelchair resting on the ground with its own wheels (12; 14) when the lifting device and the telescopic platform are fully retracted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/06; A61G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/06 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/061 (2013.01); A61G 5/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936023A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936023 A1 19990722; AT 256447 T 20040115; DE 19855178 A1 19990826; DE 59908106 D1 20040129; EP 1047366 A1 20001102; EP 1047366 B1 20031217

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908106

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2003-12-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE