Global Patent Index - EP 1047412 A1

EP 1047412 A1 2000-11-02 - NEW USE OF LOCAL ANAESTHETICS AGAINST VASCULAR HEADACHES

Title (en)

NEW USE OF LOCAL ANAESTHETICS AGAINST VASCULAR HEADACHES

Title (de)

NEUE VERWENDUNG VON LOKALANÄSTHETIKA ZUR BEHANDLUNG VASKULÄRER KOPFSCHMERZEN

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE UTILISATION D'ANESTHESIANTS LOCAUX POUR TRAITER LES CEPHALEES VASCULAIRES

Publication

EP 1047412 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963712 A

Priority

  • SE 9802299 W
  • SE 9704770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932103A1] The present invention discloses a new use of a compound of formula (I) wherein R<1> represents C3-5 alkyl; and R<2> and R<3> independently represent C1-3 alkyl; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof; for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of a vascular headache condition, particularly migraine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/135

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/135 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/138 (2006.01); C07C 217/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/138 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932103A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932103 A1 19990701; AU 1898199 A 19990712; BR 9813775 A 20001010; CA 2314452 A1 19990701; CN 1282241 A 20010131; EE 200000394 A 20011217; EP 1047412 A1 20001102; HU 0100599 A2 20020228; HU 0100599 A3 20020429; ID 26703 A 20010201; IL 136518 D0 20010614; IS 5534 A 20000615; JP 2001526217 A 20011218; NO 20003138 A 20000818; NO 20003138 D0 20000616; PL 341283 A1 20010409; SE 9704770 D0 19971219; SK 7832000 A3 20010212; TR 200001926 T2 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030751

2002-07-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/135 A, 7A 61P 25/06 B, 7C 07C 217:20 Z

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000719;LV PAYMENT 20000719;MK PAYMENT 20000719;RO PAYMENT 20000719;SI PAYMENT 20000719