Global patent index - EP 1047425 A1

EP 1047425 A1 2000-11-02 - INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

INTEGRINREZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE L'INTEGRINE

Publication

EP 1047425 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962096 A

Priority

  • GB 9810182 A
  • GB 9811283 A
  • US 9826539 W
  • US 6991097 P
  • US 8325198 P
  • US 9258898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930709A1] The present invention relates to compounds and derivatives thereof, their synthesis, and their use as vitronectin receptor antagonists. More particularly, the compounds of the present invention are antagonists of the vitronectin receptors alpha v beta 3 and/or alpha v beta 5 and are useful for inhibiting bone resorption, treating and preventing osteoporosis, and inhibiting vascular restenosis, diabetic retinopathy, macular degeneration, angiogenesis, atherosclerosis, inflammation, viral disease, and tumor growth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/435; A61K 31/40; C07D 207/26; C07D 401/06; C07D 413/06; C07D 471/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/435 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/4015 (2006.01); A61K 31/4375 (2006.01); A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 207/26 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/06 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 519/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2013.01); A61K 31/66 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 519/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/66 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930709 A1 19990624; AU 1725799 A 19990705; AU 736026 B2 20010726; CA 2315370 A1 19990624; EP 1047425 A1 20001102; EP 1047425 A4 20090422; JP 2002508323 A 20020319

INPADOC legal status

2010-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-04-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 31/435 20060101AFI19990706BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 31/40 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C07D 207/26 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C07D 413/06 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C07D 471/04 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C07D 401/06 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C07D 401/14 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2009-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C07D 519/00 20060101ALI20090319BHEP

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000717;LT PAYMENT 20000717;LV PAYMENT 20000717;MK PAYMENT 20000717;RO PAYMENT 20000717;SI PAYMENT 20000717