Global Patent Index - EP 1047447 A1

EP 1047447 A1 2000-11-02 - LIPOOLIGOSACCHARIDE-BASED VACCINE FOR PREVENTION OF MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS INFECTIONS IN MAMMALS

Title (en)

LIPOOLIGOSACCHARIDE-BASED VACCINE FOR PREVENTION OF MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS INFECTIONS IN MAMMALS

Title (de)

LIPOOLIGOSACCHARIDE ENTHALTENDER IMPFSTOFF ZUR VERHÜTUNG VON INFEKTIONEN MIT MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS IN SÄUGETIEREN

Title (fr)

VACCIN A BASE DE LIPOOLIGOSACCHARIDE DESTINE A LA PREVENTION DES INFECTIONS DUES A MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES

Publication

EP 1047447 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902170 A

Priority

  • US 9900590 W
  • US 7148398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936086A1] A conjugate vaccine for Moraxella (Branhamella) catarrhalis comprising isolated lipooligosaccharide from which esterified fatty acids have been removed, to produce a detoxified lipooligosaccharide (dLOS), or from which lipid A has been removed, to produce a detoxified oligosaccharide (OS), which is linked to an immunogenic carrier. The vaccine is useful for preventing otitis media and respiratory infections caused by M. catarrhalis in mammals, including humans.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/02; A61K 39/385; C08B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/116 (2006.01); A61K 39/295 (2006.01); A61K 39/385 (2006.01); A61P 27/16 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C08B 37/00 (2006.01); C12P 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/1045 (2013.01); C12P 19/04 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5555 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55572 (2013.01); A61K 2039/6037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936086A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936086 A1 19990722; AU 2003200964 A1 20030612; AU 2003200964 A8 20030612; AU 2003200964 B2 20041111; AU 2221299 A 19990802; BR 9906902 A 20001017; CA 2315746 A1 19990722; CN 1288384 A 20010321; EP 1047447 A1 20001102; IL 136903 D0 20010614; JP 2002509115 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-04-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LIPOOLIGOSACCHARIDE-BASED VACCINE FOR PREVENTION OF MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS INFECTIONS IN MAMMALS

2004-04-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LIPOOLIGOSACCHARIDE-BASED VACCINE FOR PREVENTION OF MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS INFECTIONS IN MAMMALS

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE