Global Patent Index - EP 1047504 A1

EP 1047504 A1 2000-11-02 - SLIT NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING A CONTINUOUS CASTING PRODUCT WITH A COOLING LIQUID

Title (en)

SLIT NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING A CONTINUOUS CASTING PRODUCT WITH A COOLING LIQUID

Title (de)

SCHLITZDÜSE ZUM BESPRÜHEN EINES STRANGGUSSPRODUKTES MIT EINER KÜHLFLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

BUSE A JET EVENTAIL DESTINE A PULVERISER UN LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT SUR UN PRODUIT DE COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1047504 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959851 A

Priority

  • CH 263997 A
  • EP 9807069 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925481A1] The inventive spray nozzle (5) comprises a mixing chamber (15) into which a liquid (7) forming a first and a second liquid flow (12, 13) flows through two inlet openings (9, 10) and which has an outlet opening (30) for a spray jet (40), said outlet opening (30) being located downstream. A mixing chamber wall (16, 17) acts as a guiding surface for the flows of liquid (12, 13) and in the area of the outlet opening (30) is shaped in such a way that the flows of liquid (12, 13) meet at said outlet opening at an angle ( alpha ), hereby forming the spray jet (40). This spraying process delivers drops with high levels of kinetic energy and produces a broad, even fanning of the drop paths with an angle of impact ( alpha ) of almost 90 DEG . As a result, the inventive spray nozzle can be used to spray large surfaces particularly evenly from a great distance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/04 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); B22D 11/124 (2006.01); C21D 1/667 (2006.01); B05B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/667 (2013.01); B05B 1/04 (2013.01); B05B 1/042 (2013.01); B21B 45/0233 (2013.01); B22D 11/1246 (2013.01); B05B 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925481A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925481 A1 19990527; AT 207389 T 20011115; AU 1560599 A 19990607; AU 733220 B2 20010510; BR 9814137 A 20001003; CA 2308507 A1 19990527; CA 2308507 C 20120110; CN 1107551 C 20030507; CN 1278748 A 20010103; CZ 20001760 A3 20010314; CZ 295473 B6 20050817; DE 59801901 D1 20011129; DK 1047504 T3 20020218; EP 1047504 A1 20001102; EP 1047504 B1 20011024; ES 2165708 T3 20020316; JP 2001523554 A 20011127; PL 194516 B1 20070629; PL 340464 A1 20010212; PT 1047504 E 20020429; RU 2213627 C2 20031010; TR 200001364 T2 20001121; TW 477722 B 20020301; US 6360973 B1 20020326; ZA 9810418 B 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151106

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161229

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160505

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151106

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 207389 T

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-05-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160505

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141103

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061105

2008-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2008-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CONCAST AG

- Free text: CONCAST STANDARD AG#TOEDISTRASSE 9#8027 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CONCAST AG#TOEDISTRASSE 9#8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-08-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2005-11-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-21 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-02-14 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165708 T3

2002-02-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20010401992

2002-02-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801901 20011129

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 207389 T 20011115

2001-09-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE