Global Patent Index - EP 1047505 A1

EP 1047505 A1 2000-11-02 - SPRAY HEAD FOR A LIQUID-PRODUCT DISTRIBUTOR

Title (en)

SPRAY HEAD FOR A LIQUID-PRODUCT DISTRIBUTOR

Title (de)

ZERSTÄUBUNGSKOPF FÜR EINEN SPENDER FÜR MEDIEN

Title (fr)

TETE DE PULVERISATION POUR UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUIT FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1047505 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900925 A

Priority

  • FR 9900063 W
  • FR 9800442 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773784A1] Atomizing head has an outlet channel (1), an atomizing orifice (9), a spring-loaded shutter (10) urged towards its closed position, and a swirl chamber (20) which is at maximum volume when the shutter is in the atomizing position. Atomizing head has an outlet channel (1), an atomizing orifice (9), a spring-loaded shutter (10) urged towards its closed position, and a swirl chamber (20) which is at maximum volume when the shutter is in the atomizing position. The shutter (10) has the atomizing orifice and swirl channels (30) connecting the outlet channel to the swirl chamber when in the atomizing position, and the volume and shape of the channels remain constant whatever the position of the shutter. The parts of the atomizer head in contact with the product are of a bacteriostatic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00; B05B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0067 (2013.01); B05B 1/3436 (2013.01); B05B 1/3473 (2013.01); B05B 11/0072 (2013.01); B05B 11/3077 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936185A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773784 A1 19990723; FR 2773784 B1 20000324; CN 1118333 C 20030820; CN 1288398 A 20010321; DE 69919321 D1 20040916; DE 69919321 T2 20050728; EP 1047505 A1 20001102; EP 1047505 B1 20040811; JP 2002509026 A 20020326; US 6443370 B1 20020903; WO 9936185 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130104

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919321

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT