Global patent index - EP 1047510 A1

EP 1047510 A1 2000-11-02 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF HOT-ROLLED, THIN FLAT PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF HOT-ROLLED, THIN FLAT PRODUCTS

Title (de)

PRODUKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -ANLAGE ZUR ENDLOSEN ERZEUGUNG VON WARMGEWALZTEN DÜNNEN FLACHPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION CONTINUE DE PRODUITS PLATS ET MINCES LAMINES A CHAUD

Publication

EP 1047510 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962221 A

Priority

  • DE 9803259 W
  • DE 19758108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758108C1] The invention relates to a method and installation for the continuous production of hot-rolled flat products made of a thin casting strip, comprising a casting machine (12) for producing a casting strip, a device for cooling the casting strip in the presence of a protective gas (2), a single-stand roughing train (3), a multiple-stand finishing train (5), a device (4) permitting a choice of cooling, heating or maintaining the temperature of the hot-rolled strip between the roughing train and finishing train (3, 5), shears (6) for separating the hot-rolled strip from coil to coil, a delivery roller table having devices for cooling (8, 9) the rolled hot strip and coiling machines (7, 10) mounted downstream from the production line for rolling up the finished strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/26; B21B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/26 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/463 (2013.01); B21B 1/26 (2013.01); B21B 2045/0212 (2013.01); B21B 2201/02 (2013.01); B21B 2201/04 (2013.01); B21B 2201/16 (2013.01); B21B 2273/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930847A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758108 C1 19990114; AT 216639 T 20020515; AU 1749399 A 19990705; AU 745206 B2 20020314; CA 2314171 A1 19990624; CA 2314171 C 20070424; EP 1047510 A1 20001102; EP 1047510 B1 20020424; ES 2172948 T3 20021001; JP 2002508253 A 20020319; JP 4677097 B2 20110427; US 6527882 B1 20030304; WO 9930847 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59803943

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SALZGITTER AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59803943

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803943

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172948

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803943

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-29

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216639

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010910

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE