Global Patent Index - EP 1047513 A1

EP 1047513 A1 2000-11-02 - PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'USINAGE D'UNE PIECE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1047513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961245 A

Priority

  • DE 19754091 A
  • DE 19815264 A
  • EP 9807782 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929450A1] The invention relates to a method for shaping a work piece (1) held between a counter holder (4, 4.1) and a guide (5, 5.1, 5.2) by a clamping force in which a profile section (3), for example, a precision teething is shaped in an area (2) of the work piece (1), whereby the shaping occurs at an angle to the clamping force (14.1, 14.2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21K 1/30; B21J 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/12 (2013.01); B21K 1/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929450A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929450 A1 19990617; WO 9929450 A8 19991125; AT 260722 T 20040315; CA 2318732 A1 19990617; CA 2318732 C 20040622; EP 1047513 A1 20001102; EP 1047513 B1 20040303; ES 2217609 T3 20041101; JP 2003509214 A 20030311; JP 4212235 B2 20090121; PT 1047513 E 20040930; RU 2216426 C2 20031120; US 2002112521 A1 20020822; US 6327887 B1 20011211; US 6584822 B2 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810933

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810933

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130603

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2013-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-06-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130603

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 260722 T

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217609 T3

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810933 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2003-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE