Global patent index - EP 1047525 A1

EP 1047525 A1 2000-11-02 - GRINDING DISC WITH A PERIPHERAL GROOVE

Title (en)

GRINDING DISC WITH A PERIPHERAL GROOVE

Title (de)

SCHLEIFSCHEIBE MIT UMFANGSRILLE

Title (fr)

DISQUE A MEULER DOTE D'UNE RAINURE PERIPHERIQUE

Publication

EP 1047525 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99902539 A

Priority

  • DE 19801377 A
  • EP 9900195 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801377A1] The grindstone (20) has a stop surface (8) at each of two opposite flat sides (I, II). There are two circumferential grooves (13, 14) in the grindstone, one in each of the two stop surfaces. Both the circumferential grooves are at the same spacing (X) from their respective stop surfaces. The grindstone grinds the edges of glass disks (11) with cooling fluid supplied to the grinding point (18) while the grindstone has one of its stop surfaces against a counter-surface (7) on the grinding spindle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/08; B24B 9/10; B24D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/10 (2006.01); B24B 55/02 (2006.01); B24D 5/02 (2006.01); B24D 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/10 (2013.01); B24B 55/02 (2013.01); B24D 5/02 (2013.01); B24D 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936225A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801377 A1 19990722; DE 19801377 C2 20010705; AT 206343 T 20011015; EP 1047525 A1 20001102; EP 1047525 B1 20011004; ES 2162515 T3 20011216; US 6287176 B1 20010911; WO 9936225 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100116

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WENDT G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-14 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20050908

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-01-22 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030122

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030115

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030113

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.

- Effective date: 20011120

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011218

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-01-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2162515

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-08

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU PT SE

2001-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 206343

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU PT SE