Global Patent Index - EP 1047526 A1

EP 1047526 A1 2000-11-02 - DEVICE FOR DRESSING A GRINDSTONE TO POLISH THE RUNNING SURFACE STRUCTURE OF A SKI

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DRESSING A GRINDSTONE TO POLISH THE RUNNING SURFACE STRUCTURE OF A SKI

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABRICHTEN EINES SCHLEIFSTEINES ZUM SCHLEIFEN EINER LAUFFLÄCHENSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN SKI

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DRESSER UNE MEULE EN VUE DE POLIR LA STRUCTURE DE SEMELLE D'UN SKI

Publication

EP 1047526 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99900391 A

Priority

  • AT 9900009 W
  • AT 5298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936227A1] Disclosed is a device for dressing a grindstone (1) to polish the running surface structure of a ski. Said device comprises a rotating drive (7) for the grindstone (1), a planing tool (2) with at least one cutting insert that can be placed on the peripheral surface of the grindstone (1) and a feed drive (6) carrying out a relative movement parallel to the axis of the planing tool (2) in relation to the grindstone. In order to provide advantageous manufacturing conditions, the feed drive (6) and/or the rotating drive (7) include a control device (8) with a control program storage (9) that can be selected by means of an input device (10), in addition to an evaluation circuit (12) that is connected to the control program storage (9) to determine the switching points for the speed of the feed device (6) and/or the rotating drive (7), depending on the program selected and the position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 53/075; B24B 53/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/04 (2006.01); B24B 3/00 (2006.01); B24B 53/075 (2006.01); B24B 53/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 3/006 (2013.01); A63C 11/04 (2013.01); B24B 53/075 (2013.01); B24B 53/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936227A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936227 A1 19990722; AT 406463 B 20000525; AT A5298 A 19991015; DE 59902834 D1 20021031; EP 1047526 A1 20001102; EP 1047526 B1 20020925; US 6416383 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ERNST KNOLL FEINMECHANIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902834

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-31

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-09-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI