Global patent index - EP 1047546 A1

EP 1047546 A1 2000-11-02 - SHEET OF EMBOSSED ABSORBENT PAPER, AND A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

SHEET OF EMBOSSED ABSORBENT PAPER, AND A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

GEPRÄGTE ABSORBIERENDE PAPIERBAHN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

FEUILLE DE PAPIER ABSORBANT GAUFRE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE LA FABRIQUER

Publication

EP 1047546 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900511 A

Priority

  • FR 9900029 W
  • FR 9800230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773564A1] The absorbent paper has one embossed zone to give a ground weft pattern, where the number of embossings is \-30 per cm<2> in one embossed zone, at one height level (H1) from the plane of the embossing. At least one further pattern is formed in other embossed zones, with a height level (H2) which is greater than the height (H1) of the first zones. The height (H2) of the embossing in the second zones is expressed as H2 <= 1.2\*H1. The mean dia. of the disks inscribed in a further zone without embossings is greater than the mean dia. of the disks inscribed between the embossings at the ground weft pattern, and pref. twice and especially three times the dia. Each element of the second pattern has at least two of the further zones without embossing, adjacent to and defined by the separated embossings. The peaks of the separated embmossings are equal to the dimensions of the embossings in the first zone. The second zone has a calendered surface at least partially. The embossings are within the paper ply structure, and the two plys are at least partially bonded together. An Independent claim is included for a machine to produce the paper with at least one non-distorting cylinder. It has one zone with at least 30 projetions/cm<2>, and a second zone without projections, with the base of both zones at the same level. The mean dia. of the disks inscribed at the second zone is larger than in the first zone. Preferred Features: The second zones are adjacent, and separated from each other by separate embossings. The machine has a cylinder with a resilient mantle cladding, to work with the rigid embossing cylinder. The resilience of the mantle cladding gives it a contact with the base of the second zones, without being in contact with the base of the first zone. The rubber material of the resilient mantle cladding gives two penetration depths for the embossing projections at the rigid cylinder. The resilient mantle cladding allows the paper material to make contact with the base of the engraving for the second zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/07; D21H 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); D21H 27/40 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/40 (2013.01); B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0728 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0733 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0756 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0766 (2013.01); D21H 27/02 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1023 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24463 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936253A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773564 A1 19990716; FR 2773564 B1 20000211; AT 255494 T 20031215; DE 69913315 D1 20040115; DE 69913315 T2 20041014; DK 1047546 T3 20040413; EP 1047546 A1 20001102; EP 1047546 B1 20031203; ES 2212518 T3 20040716; TR 200002028 T2 20001221; US 6524683 B1 20030225; WO 9936253 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2212518

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-03-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69913315

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-01-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040111

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU PT SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU PT SE