Global Patent Index - EP 1047557 B1

EP 1047557 B1 2001-12-19 - PRINTING DEVICE

Title (en)

PRINTING DEVICE

Title (de)

DRUCKEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 1047557 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962249 A

Priority

  • DE 9803302 W
  • DE 19750885 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19750885C1] The printer has printing heads (6.1-6.4) with double print cylinders (3.1,3.2). An operating chamber (5) is defined between adjacent cylinders adjacent to one side of the machine. The directly adjacent double print cylinders define an acute angle between them (alpha). The tip of the angle extends adjacent to the adjacent heads.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/10; B41F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19750885 C1 19990408; BR 9814881 A 20001003; CN 1103687 C 20030326; CN 1278211 A 20001227; EP 1047557 A1 20001102; EP 1047557 B1 20011219; JP 2001523598 A 20011127; JP 3469196 B2 20031125; RU 2000115953 A 20040320; RU 2175608 C1 20011110; US 6220156 B1 20010424; WO 9925556 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151105

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111106

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802585 20020131

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE