Global Patent Index - EP 1047559 A2

EP 1047559 A2 2000-11-02 - METHOD AND CONTROL FOR CONVEYING A STRIPLIKE RECORDING MEDIUM WITH MARGINAL PERFORATION IN A PRINTER

Title (en)

METHOD AND CONTROL FOR CONVEYING A STRIPLIKE RECORDING MEDIUM WITH MARGINAL PERFORATION IN A PRINTER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND STEUERUNG ZUM TRANSPORT EINES BANDFÖRMIGEN AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERS MIT RANDLOCHUNG IN EINEM DRUCKER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET COMMANDE POUR LE TRANSPORT D'UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT EN FORME DE BANDE A PERFORATION MARGINALE DANS UNE IMPRIMANTE

Publication

EP 1047559 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98961168 A

Priority

  • DE 19749645 A
  • EP 9807170 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924262A2] The invention relates to a method and a control for a drive (8) which is devoid of a sprocket feed and located in an electrographic printer which outputs information on a striplike recording medium divided up into pages. It is possible to determine in start mode whether perforated or non-perforated paper has been inserted into the printer. A recording medium with marginal perforation (21) is initially conveyed in steps according to a control grid until it fits tightly into a larger conveyor grid which corresponds to a fraction of the distance between perforations. Subsequently, the recording medium (5) is conveyed in normal operating mode in steps according to the conveyor grid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 11/28 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/28 (2013.01); B41J 11/0085 (2013.01); B41J 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924262A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924262 A2 19990520; WO 9924262 A3 19990715; EP 1047559 A2 20001102; EP 1047559 B1 20020313; US 6318916 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803391

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803391

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2014-06-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20140513

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH, 85586 POING, DE

- Document: DE 59803391

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803391

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803391

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803391

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803391 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB