Global Patent Index - EP 1047594 A1

EP 1047594 A1 2000-11-02 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HEAT SEALING CONTAINERS AND FOR FILLING THE SAME

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HEAT SEALING CONTAINERS AND FOR FILLING THE SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSIEGELN DURCH HITZE UND FÜLLEN VON BEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE THERMOSCELLAGE DE RECIPIENTS ET DE REMPLISSAGE DE CES DERNIERS

Publication

EP 1047594 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958920 A

Priority

  • EP 9807608 W
  • IT MI972736 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929571A1] A method and an apparatus for manufacturing containers by thermoforming synthetic material in film form and for filling them with a product comprising a step for producing containers by thermoforming at least one strip (3) which is composed of at least two mutually facing films made of heat-sealable synthetic material and in which pockets are formed between the two films, and a step for filling the pockets with a product. The thermoforming step is performed while the at least one strip (3) is arranged on a substantially vertical plane, forming as a whole at least two rows of pockets which are arranged substantially horizontally at mutually different elevations. The filling step is performed while the strips (3), each of which bears a row of pockets, are spaced laterally from each other and are arranged at mutually different elevations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 1/02; B29C 65/00; B29C 65/18; B29C 65/78; B65B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/093 (2012.01); B65B 43/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/093 (2013.01); B65B 43/465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929571 A1 19990617; AU 1488899 A 19990628; DE 69814689 D1 20030618; DE 69814689 T2 20040408; EP 1047594 A1 20001102; EP 1047594 B1 20030514; IT 1296951 B1 19990803; IT MI972736 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2003-08-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814689 P 20030618

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE