Global Patent Index - EP 1047598 A1

EP 1047598 A1 2000-11-02 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING A PRODUCT, IN PARTICULAR FOR PACKAGING A FOOD PRODUCT

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR TREATING A PRODUCT, IN PARTICULAR FOR PACKAGING A FOOD PRODUCT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN EINES PRODUKTS, INSBESONDERE ZUM VERPACKEN EINES ERNÄHRUNGSPRODUKTS

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR TRAITER UN PRODUIT, EN PARTICULIER POUR EMBALLER UN PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE

Publication

EP 1047598 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99951032 A

Priority

  • IB 9901746 W
  • IT BO980628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0029291A1] Apparatus (10, 100) for treating a product, in particular for packaging a food product (12, 112), said product preferably being in the form of portions (14) of a molten cheese or the like or of portions (114) of a soft, semi-hard cheese or the like obtained by cutting a whole cake (114'). The apparatus comprising a line (20, 120) for conveying the product (12, 112) between the various stations of the apparatus, and one or more movable organs (22, 122) for supporting the product to transfer the product (12, 112) along said line (20, 120).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/06; B65G 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/06 (2006.01); B65G 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/068 (2013.01); B65G 17/002 (2013.01); B65G 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029291A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0029291 A1 20000525; AU 6360699 A 20000605; EP 1047598 A1 20001102; IT 1304412 B1 20010319; IT BO980628 A1 20000515; IT BO980628 D0 19981113

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORAZZA S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 25/06 A, 7B 65G 17/00 B, 7B 65B 25/12 B, 7B 65B 35/30 B, 7B 65G 47/74 B, 7B 65G 17/32 B

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE