Global Patent Index - EP 1047600 A1

EP 1047600 A1 2000-11-02 - PACKAGING MACHINE

Title (en)

PACKAGING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A EMBALLER

Publication

EP 1047600 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931187 A

Priority

  • SE 9801285 W
  • SE 9702530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901346A1] The invention relates to a packaging machine comprising a horizontal conveyor and stations along this for processing packaging blanks, preferably case blanks, up to ready cases filled with product. The conveyor is constructed around pivotal gear bearings (roller path bearings) or the like, whereby one of the bearing races defines a circular conveyor path, and holders or carrier fingers for the case blanks are arranged on the driven race in the bearing arrangement. The arrangement allows a packaging machine structure where the essential elements are constituted by standard components, and by placing a plurality of bearing rings vertically above one another in the machine frame, possibilities for a flexible camshaft arrangement and format adjustment in the height direction are offered, as well as an open and easily accessible structure being obtained for maintenance and repair. In an alternative embodiment, the camshaft arrangement can comprise a camshaft placed in the centre of the pivotal ring bearing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 65/02; B65B 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 65/02 (2006.01); B65B 43/50 (2006.01); B65B 59/00 (2006.01); B65B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/50 (2013.01); B65B 59/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901346A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901346 A1 19990114; AT 276142 T 20041015; AU 8136998 A 19990125; CZ 297636 B6 20070221; CZ 9904562 A3 20001213; DE 69826321 D1 20041021; DE 69826321 T2 20051103; DK 1047600 T3 20050131; EP 1047600 A1 20001102; EP 1047600 B1 20040915; ES 2227851 T3 20050401; HU 0003091 A2 20010129; HU 0003091 A3 20040428; HU 227146 B1 20100830; NO 315363 B1 20030825; NO 996570 A 20000225; NO 996570 D0 19991230; PL 190815 B1 20060228; PL 337733 A1 20000828; RU 2203203 C2 20030427; SE 509815 C2 19990308; SE 9702530 D0 19970701; SE 9702530 L 19990102

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-02 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180630

2018-06-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69826321

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170704

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170515

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2006-03-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227851 T3

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2004-12-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826321 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A&R CARTON AB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000106

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE