Global patent index - EP 1047619 A1

EP 1047619 A1 2000-11-02 - POSITIONING APPARATUS

Title (en)

POSITIONING APPARATUS

Title (de)

POSITIONIERUNGSAPPARAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1047619 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925991 A

Priority

  • SE 9800857 W
  • SE 9702081 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854076A1] The disclosure relates to a positioning apparatus for workpieces whose length is to be adjusted. The apparatus includes a conveyor which advances the workpieces. Beside this feed conveyor, there is an additional conveyor on which adjustable abutment means are mounted. The two conveyors move at the same speed and in the same direction, so that each one of the abutment means, throughout the entire movement, is located in register with one and the same workpiece. A transverse displacement device realises the lateral displacement of the workpieces until such time as the abutment means receive them. The abutment means may be either stepwise or continuoulsy adjustable. For a further stabilisation of the workpieces, there is a rail mounted at the discharge end of the conveyor, so that the end of each workpiece will slide along this rail without being displaced in the transverse direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 47/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/22 (2006.01); B27B 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/228 (2013.01); B27B 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854076A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854076 A1 19981203; AT 248763 T 20030915; CA 2292567 A1 19981203; CA 2292567 C 20060704; DE 69817873 D1 20031009; DE 69817873 T2 20040311; EP 1047619 A1 20001102; EP 1047619 B1 20030903; SE 511453 C2 19991004; SE 9702081 D0 19970530; SE 9702081 L 19981201

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69817873

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR LI

2003-09-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR LI