Global Patent Index - EP 1047624 A1

EP 1047624 A1 2000-11-02 - APPARATUS FOR THE DELIVERY OF A GASSIFIED LIQUID, AND BEVERAGE CARBONATOR

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR THE DELIVERY OF A GASSIFIED LIQUID, AND BEVERAGE CARBONATOR

Title (de)

ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GASENTHALTENDE FLÜSSIGKEIT UND KARBONATOR FÜR GETRÄNKE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'APPORT DE LIQUIDE GAZEIFIE ET CARBONATEUR A BOISSONS

Publication

EP 1047624 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901015 A

Priority

  • GB 9900082 W
  • GB 9800532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936346A1] A beverage carbonator comprises a carbonating apparatus including a chamber (14), in which a quantity of potable liquid is located, having an upper level (16). A quantity of carbon dioxide is maintained in the space (17) above the upper level (16), at a relatively high pressure. Extending from the chamber (14) is a circuit (22) which passes through a dispensing head (42), and returns to an inlet (21<u>b</u>) of the chamber, from which a conduit (23) extends, terminating at a position well below the level (16) of the liquid in the chamber. The conduit (23) is provided at a location just above the surface of the liquid, with a gas inlet (25), adjacent to which is a venturi device, such that as liquid flows through the conduit into the chamber, gas is drawn from the space above the level of liquid into the liquid. Thus, liquid is caused to flow into the chamber carrying with it carbon dioxide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0071 (2013.01); B67D 1/0057 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936346A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936346 A1 19990722; AU 2064999 A 19990802; DE 69912095 D1 20031120; EP 1047624 A1 20001102; EP 1047624 B1 20031015; GB 2334221 A 19990818; GB 2334221 B 20020220; GB 9800532 D0 19980311

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100112

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100112

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040116

2004-01-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912095 P 20031120

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE SE

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE SE

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE