Global Patent Index - EP 1047649 A1

EP 1047649 A1 2000-11-02 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND EXAMPLES OF SUCH COMPOSITE MATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND EXAMPLES OF SUCH COMPOSITE MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOMPOSITWERKSTOFFEN UND VERTRETER SOLCHER KOMPOSITWERKSTOFFE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MATERIAUX COMPOSITES, ET EXEMPLES DE TELS MATERIAUX COMPOSITES

Publication

EP 1047649 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955824 A

Priority

  • DE 9903155 W
  • DE 19845532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19845532A1] The aim of the invention is to economically produce composite materials which contain silicon nitride and metal silicide and which comprise determined electrical properties while using few pieces of equipment. According to the invention, it should be possible to produce shaped bodies with close to final contours from the composite materials before sintering and to provide examples of such composite materials. To these ends, the invention provides a method in which a starting material containing Si3N4 and metal silicide is subjected to gas pressure sintering in an atmosphere containing nitrogen. In addition, Me5Si3 is introduced as metal silicide into the starting material. The nitrogen partial pressure is determined according to the sintering temperature such that Si3N4 remains stabile at the lower limit of the applicable area and Me5Si3 remains stabile at the upper limit. The invention also provides a composite material which contains silicon and whose silicon-containing constituents are comprised of Si3N4 and of a metal silicide, whereby the metal silicide is selected from the group Nb5Si3, V5Si3, Ta5Si3 and W5Si3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/58; C04B 35/593

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/584 (2006.01); C04B 35/58 (2006.01); C04B 35/593 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/58092 (2013.01); C04B 35/5935 (2013.01); C04B 35/645 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0020352A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845532 A1 20000406; EP 1047649 A1 20001102; JP 2002526374 A 20020820; JP 4755342 B2 20110824; US 6737015 B1 20040518; WO 0020352 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20130701

2009-09-02 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17C

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950909

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE