Global Patent Index - EP 1047689 A1

EP 1047689 A1 2000-11-02 - SUBSTITUTED GUANIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED GUANIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE GUANIDIN-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON TIERISCHEN SCHÄDLINGEN

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE GUANIDINE SUBSTITUES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES PARASITES ANIMAUX

Publication

EP 1047689 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966405 A

Priority

  • DE 19800400 A
  • EP 9808444 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19800400A1] The present invention relates to novel guanidine derivatives of formula (1), wherein R<1> represents a five or six membered heterocyclic group containing 1, 2, 3 or 4 nitrogen atoms and/or one or two oxygen or sulphur atoms as heteroatom ring members, whereby the number of heteroatoms is 1, 2, 3 or 4 and is optionally substituted by halogen, cyano, nitro, alkyl, halogen alkane, alkenyl, halogen alkenyl, alkinyl, alkoxy, halogen alkoxy, alkenyloxy, halogen alkenyloxy, alkinyloxy, alkylthio, halogen alkanethio, alkenylthio, halogen alkenylthio, alkinylthio, alkylsulphinyl, halogen alkanesulphinyl, alkylsulphonyl, amino, alkylamino, dialkylamino, aryl, arylthio, arylamino, aralkyl, formylamino, alkylcarbonylamino, formyl, carbamoyl, alkylcarbonyl and or alkoxycarbonyl, R<2> represents hydrogen or alkyl, R<3> represents groups -OCR<4>, -OCOR<5>, OCOOR<6>, OCONR<7>R<8> and -OSO<2>R<9>, whereby R<4> and R<6> represent independently of each other alkyl, alkoxyalkyl, halogen alkane, alkenyl, alkinyl, alkylaminoalkyl, dialkylaminoalkyl, optionally substituted cycloalkyl and optionally substituted phenyl or benzyl, R<7> and R<8> represent independently of each other hydrogen, alkyl, alkenyl and optionally substituted phenyl or benzyl and R<9> represents alkyl or optionally substituted pheyl, A represents groups -CH2CH2-, (CH2)3 and -CH=CH- and Z represents cyano or nitro, with the proviso that when Z represents NO2 and A represents -CH2CH2, the radical R<2> represents hydrogen and the compound of formula (1), wherein R<1> corresponds to formula (II), R<2> = H, R<3> = OCH3, A = -CH2CH2- and Z = NO2, is excluded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 401/06; A01N 43/50; A01N 43/78; C07D 417/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/50 (2006.01); A01N 43/78 (2006.01); A01N 47/40 (2006.01); A01N 51/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 417/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/06 (2013.01); A01N 47/40 (2013.01); A01N 51/00 (2013.01); C07D 417/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935141A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800400 A1 19990715; AU 2275999 A 19990726; BR 9813241 A 20010102; CN 1191247 C 20050302; CN 1285827 A 20010228; CN 1550498 A 20041201; CN 1810807 A 20060802; EP 1047689 A1 20001102; JP 2002500222 A 20020108; US 2003119828 A1 20030626; US 6503912 B1 20030107; US 6667310 B2 20031223; WO 9935141 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-02-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SUBSTITUTED GUANIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040608

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020612

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL