Global Patent Index - EP 1047699 A1

EP 1047699 A1 2000-11-02 - PLATELET ADP RECEPTOR INHIBITORS

Title (en)

PLATELET ADP RECEPTOR INHIBITORS

Title (de)

PLATELET ADP REZEPTOR INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DES RECEPTEURS D'ADP DES PLAQUETTES

Publication

EP 1047699 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902148 A

Priority

  • US 9900518 W
  • US 9210998 P
  • US 753798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936425A1] The invention relates to novel compounds of formula (I) containing fused heterocyclic ring systems which are effective platelet ADP receptor inhibitors. Such compounds including pharmaceutically acceptable salts are useful in various pharmaceutical compositions for the prevention and/or treatment of cardiovascular disease particularly those related to thrombosis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 513/04; A61K 31/54; C07D 513/14; C07D 519/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/549 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/14 (2006.01); C07D 519/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 513/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936425A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936425 A1 19990722; AU 2219599 A 19990802; CA 2318199 A1 19990722; EP 1047699 A1 20001102; JP 2002509152 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAIBELMAN, ALAN M.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANTZEN, HANS-MICHAEL

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONLEY, PAMELA, B.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRETTO, LARRY, J.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT, M.

2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAIBELMAN, ALAN M.

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANTZEN, HANS-MICHAEL

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONLEY, PAMELA, B.

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRETTO, LARRY, J.

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT, M.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAIBELMAN, ALAN M.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANTZEN, HANS-MICHAEL

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONLEY, PAMELA, B.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRETTO, LARRY, J.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT, M.

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAIBELMAN, ALAN M.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANTZEN, HANS-MICHAEL

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONLEY, PAMELA, B.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRETTO, LARRY, J.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT, M.

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE