Global Patent Index - EP 1047713 A4

EP 1047713 A4 2001-05-30 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT CES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1047713 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99905429 A

Priority

  • US 9900608 W
  • US 598698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935168A1] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/47; C12N 5/10; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935168 A1 19990715; AU 2558599 A 19990726; CA 2317382 A1 19990715; EP 1047713 A1 20001102; EP 1047713 A4 20010530; JP 2002511232 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2001-05-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE