Global Patent Index - EP 1047790 A1

EP 1047790 A1 2000-11-02 - ROOT-SPECIFIC PROMOTER

Title (en)

ROOT-SPECIFIC PROMOTER

Title (de)

WURZELSPEZIFISCHER PROMOTOR

Title (fr)

PROMOTEUR SPECIFIQUE DES RACINES

Publication

EP 1047790 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98957061 A

Priority

IB 9802000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0029594A1] A DNA which has the sequence shown in Figure 5 and which defines a gene promoter region has been isolated from maize roots. The promoter may be used for driving expression of foreign genes in the roots of plants. This is particularly useful for expressing an insecticidal toxin, such as a delta-endotoxin of Bacillus thuringiensis, to impart resistance to insect attack on the roots of plants by Coleopteran insects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8227 (2013.01); C12N 15/8286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029594A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0029594 A1 20000525; AU 1347999 A 20000605; CA 2317723 A1 20000525; EP 1047790 A1 20001102; JP 2002537760 A 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021211

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELY, SUSAN

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EVANS, IAN, JEFFREY

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUCH, WOLFGANG, WALTER

2001-01-31 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001124;LT PAYMENT 20001124;LV PAYMENT 20001124;MK PAYMENT 20001124;RO PAYMENT 20001124;SI PAYMENT 20001124

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE