Global Patent Index - EP 1047792 A1

EP 1047792 A1 2000-11-02 - A METHOD FOR DEPOPULATING OF VERTEBRATE TESTIS AND FOR GENERATION OF TRANSGENIC SPECIES

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR DEPOPULATING OF VERTEBRATE TESTIS AND FOR GENERATION OF TRANSGENIC SPECIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ENTVÖLKERUNG VON VERTEBRATE-TESTIS UND ZUR GENERIERUNG VON TRANSGENEN TIERARTEN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE DEPEUPLER UN TESTICULE DE VERTEBRE ET DE GENERER UNE ESPECE TRANSGENIQUE

Publication

EP 1047792 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924219 A

Priority

  • US 9910573 W
  • US 9824238 W
  • US 19192098 A
  • US 9908277 W
  • US 29272399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0029601A1] A composition for in vitro and in vivo transfection of vertebrate male germ cells comprises a nucleic acid or transgene, and a gene delivery system, and optionally a protective internalizing agent, such as an endosomal lytic agent, a virus or a viral component, which is internalized by cells along with the transgene and which enhances gene transfer through the cytoplasm to the nucleus of the male germ cell. A method of genetically altering a vertebrate male germ cell in vivo employs a lentiviral-derived vector. A method of substantially depopulating a vertebrate testis employs a combination of a dose of an alkylating agent, such as busulfan, chlorambucil, cyclophosphamide, melphalan, or ethyl ethanesulfonic acid, and a dose of gamma radiation. A pharmaceutical preparation and a transfer kit utilize the composition. A method for introducing a polynucleotide into vertebrate male germ cells comprises the administration of the composition to a vertebrate. A method for isolating or selecting transfected cells utilizes a reporter gene, and a method for administering transfected male germ cells utilizes male germ cells which have been transfected in vitro.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/89; A01K 67/027; A61K 48/00; C12N 5/06; C12N 15/86; C12N 15/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/255 (2006.01); A61K 31/573 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61K 35/52 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/076 (2010.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); A01K 67/027 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 5/061 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 35/12 (2013.01); C12N 2510/00 (2013.01); C12N 2510/02 (2013.01); C12N 2799/021 (2013.01); C12N 2799/022 (2013.01); C12N 2799/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029601A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0029601 A1 20000525; AU 4077199 A 20000605; EP 1047792 A1 20001102; JP 2003525581 A 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070307

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPERIAL COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE