Global Patent Index - EP 1047796 A1

EP 1047796 A1 2000-11-02 - TAPPING LAUNDER FOR AN IRON SMELT

Title (en)

TAPPING LAUNDER FOR AN IRON SMELT

Title (de)

ABSTICHRINNE FÜR EINE EISENSCHMELZE

Title (fr)

CHENAL DE COULEE POUR UN BAIN DE FER

Publication

EP 1047796 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903612 A

Priority

  • EP 9900072 W
  • LU 90195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936580A1] The invention relates to a tapping launder for an iron smelt, comprising an outer support structure (10), a fireproof lining (16, 18) and a copper lining (20) with ducted cooling. Said copper lining (20) surrounds the fireproof lining (18) in the support structure (10). Solid ribs (32) on the copper lining (20) project deep into the fireproof lining (18). The main purpose of said ribs is to cool any iron smelt which penetrates through cracks in the fireproof lining (18) to hardening, hereby stopping said smelt before it comes into contact with the solid copper base body. This prevents cracks caused by overheating from forming in the solid copper base body, hereby reducing the risk of coolant leaking into the iron smelt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/14; F27D 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/14 (2006.01); F27D 1/12 (2006.01); F27D 3/14 (2006.01); F27D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/14 (2013.01); F27D 1/12 (2013.01); F27D 3/14 (2013.01); F27D 1/00 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0016 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0018 (2013.01); F27D 2009/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936580A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936580 A1 19990722; AT 233827 T 20030315; AU 2420499 A 19990802; AU 738253 B2 20010913; BR 9908364 A 20001128; CA 2318171 A1 19990722; DE 59904444 D1 20030410; EP 1047796 A1 20001102; EP 1047796 B1 20030305; JP 2002509193 A 20020326; JP 4199419 B2 20081217; LU 90195 A1 19990716

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130108

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130108

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904444

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130108

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 233827 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PAUL *WURTH

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904444 P 20030410

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020529

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE