Global Patent Index - EP 1047801 A1

EP 1047801 A1 2000-11-02 - HIGH TEMPERATURE OXIDATION RESISTANT DUCTILE NICKEL ALLOY

Title (en)

HIGH TEMPERATURE OXIDATION RESISTANT DUCTILE NICKEL ALLOY

Title (de)

HOCHWARMFESTE, OXIDATIONSBESTÄNDIGE KNETBARE NICKELLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

SUPERALLIAGE DE NICKEL MALAXABLE ET STABLE A L'OXYDATION

Publication

EP 1047801 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954347 A

Priority

  • DE 19753539 A
  • EP 9806335 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753539A1] Ductile austenitic nickel alloy for objects with a high resistance to isothermal and cylic high temperature oxidation, high heat resistance and long-time rupture strength up to 1 200 DEG C, especially in the 700-900 DEG C temperature range. The inventive alloy consists of 0.20-0.40 wt. % carbon, 25-30 wt. % chrome, 7.5-8.5 wt. % tantalum, 2.3-3.00 wt. % aluminium, 0.01-0.15 wt. % yttrium, 0.01- 0.20 wt. % titanium, 0.01-0.20 wt. % niobium, 0.01-0.15 zircon, 0.001-0.010 wt. % magnesium, 0.001-0.010 wt. % calcium, max. 0.030 wt. % nitrogen, max 0.50 wt . % silicon, max 0.25 wt. % manganese, max 0.020 wt. % phosphorous, max. 0.010 wt. % sulphur. The remainder includes nickel and unavoidable impurities due to smelting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 19/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928515A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753539 A1 19990617; DE 19753539 C2 20000621; EP 1047801 A1 20001102; EP 1047801 B1 20011219; WO 9928515 A1 19990610; ZA 9810883 B 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802586

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081005

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081005

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-02-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802586

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB